There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

MONARCH Act of 2020
Monarch Action, Recovery, and Conservation of Habitat Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To encourage and facilitate efforts by States and other stakeholders to conserve and sustain the western population of monarch butterflies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/14/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
03/05/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/27/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/14/2020Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2020Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2020Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 02/14/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/14/2020
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/14/2020
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/14/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/25/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/25/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/25/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/25/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/26/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/28/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/28/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 03/02/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 03/02/2020
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 03/02/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 03/16/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 04/23/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/23/2020
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 04/23/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/23/2020
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/15/2020

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Agriculture02/14/2020 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry03/05/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources02/14/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife02/27/2020 Referred to
House Appropriations02/14/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5920. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2020)

Monarch Action, Recovery, and Conservation of Habitat Act of 2020 or the MONARCH Act of 2020

This bill provides support for the conservation of western monarch butterflies (the monarch butterfly population that overwinters along the coast of California and breeds across California, Arizona, Nevada, Washington, Oregon, Idaho, and Utah).

Specifically, the bill establishes the Western Monarch Butterfly Rescue Fund. The Department of Agriculture (USDA) must use amounts in the fund to provide grants for the conservation of such butterflies.

In addition, USDA must transfer amounts from the fund to the National Fish and Wildlife Foundation to implement the Western Monarch Butterfly Conservation Plan, which was prepared by the Western Association of Fish and Wildlife Agencies.