There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Crimea Annexation Non-recognition Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Crimea Annexation Non-recognition Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To prohibit United States Government recognition of the Russian Federation's claim of sovereignty over Crimea, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit United States Government recognition of Russia's annexation of Crimea.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/12/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 427 - 1 (Roll no. 122).(text: CR H2660)
01/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
03/13/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
03/12/2019-2:41pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
03/12/2019-2:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/12/2019-2:41pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 427 - 1 (Roll no. 122). (text: CR H2660)
03/12/2019-2:34pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2675)
03/12/2019-12:58pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/12/2019-12:40pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 596.
03/12/2019-12:40pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2660-2662)
03/12/2019-12:39pmHouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/07/2019HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules,.
03/07/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
03/07/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/16/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/16/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/16/2019 Referred to
03/07/2019 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations03/13/2019 Referred to

As of 10/17/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.596 - Crimea Annexation Non-recognition Act


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.596. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (03/12/2019)

Crimea Annexation Non-recognition Act

The bill prohibits any federal agency from taking any action or extending any assistance that recognizes or implies recognition of Russia's sovereignty over Crimea, its airspace, or its territorial waters.

The President may waive such prohibitions on a case-by-case basis if such a waiver is vital to U.S. national security interests.