There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medical Cannabis Research Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase the number of manufacturers registered under the Controlled Substances Act to manufacture cannabis for legitimate research purposes, to authorize health care providers of the Department of Veterans Affairs to provide recommendations to veterans regarding participation in federally approved cannabis clinical trials, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
03/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/16/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/16/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/25/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary01/16/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/04/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs01/16/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/08/2019 Referred to

As of 08/24/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.601 - Medical Cannabis Research Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.