There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Microloan Transparency and Accountability Act of 2020

Short Titles as Introduced

Microloan Transparency and Accountability Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to increase transparency and to enhance the use of microloans in rural areas, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/14/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
03/04/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/15/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
09/14/2020-2:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/14/2020-2:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4347)
09/14/2020-2:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6078.
09/14/2020-2:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4347-4348)
09/14/2020-2:39pmHouseMs. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/11/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
03/11/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
03/04/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
03/04/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3]* 03/04/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business03/04/2020 Referred to
03/11/2020 Markup by
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship09/15/2020 Referred to

As of 10/19/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6078 - Microloan Transparency and Accountability Act of 2020


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6078. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/04/2020)

Microloan Transparency and Accountability Act of 2020

This bill modifies provisions related to the Small Business Administration's (SBA) disbursement of certain financial assistance.

Specifically, the bill establishes a 5% technical assistance grant for intermediaries who make 25% of their loans to rural small businesses. Further, the bill requires the SBA to report certain metrics related to the disbursement of microloans to small businesses, including (1) the number, amount, and percentage of such loans that went into default in the previous year; (2) the extent to which microloans are provided to small businesses in rural areas; and (3) the average size, rate of interest, and amount of fees charged for each microloan.