There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

STOP FGM Act of 2020
Strengthening the Opposition to Female Genital Mutilation Act of 2020

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

STOP FGM Act of 2020
Strengthening the Opposition to Female Genital Mutilation Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

STOP FGM Act of 2020
Strengthening the Opposition to Female Genital Mutilation Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Introduced

STOP FGM Act of 2020
Strengthening the Opposition to Female Genital Mutilation Act of 2020

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

STOP FGM Act of 2020
Strengthening the Opposition to Female Genital Mutilation Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to clarify the criminalization of female genital mutilation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
01/05/2021Became Public Law No: 116-309. (TXT | PDF)
01/05/2021Signed by President.
12/24/2020Presented to President.
12/15/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/15/2020Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7509)
09/21/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/16/2020Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-506.
03/05/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/05/2021Became Public Law No: 116-309. (TXT | PDF)
01/05/2021Signed by President.
12/24/2020HousePresented to President.
12/16/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/15/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/15/2020SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7509)
09/22/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
09/21/2020-3:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/21/2020-3:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4589-4590)
09/21/2020-3:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6100.
09/21/2020-3:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4589-4592)
09/21/2020-3:19pmHouseMs. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/16/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 406.
09/16/2020HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-506.
03/11/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/11/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/05/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/05/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 03/05/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 03/11/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary03/05/2020 Referred to
03/11/2020 Markup by
09/16/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-506
Senate Judiciary09/22/2020 Referred to
12/15/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (0)

With the start of a new Congress, summaries from prior Congresses may be delayed or abbreviated.