There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Child Interstate Abortion Notification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit taking minors across State lines in circumvention of laws requiring the involvement of parents in abortion decisions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/16/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/22/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/22/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 01/22/2019
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21] 01/22/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 01/22/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/05/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/05/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/05/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 02/05/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/05/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 02/05/2019
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 02/05/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 02/05/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/25/2019
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/25/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 02/25/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 03/05/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 03/08/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 04/30/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/03/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/16/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/04/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.611. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/16/2019)

Child Interstate Abortion Notification Act

This bill creates new federal crimes related to transporting a minor across state lines for an abortion.

It makes it a crime to knowingly transport a minor to another state to obtain an abortion without satisfying a parental involvement law in the minor's resident state. A parental involvement law requires parental consent or notification, or judicial authorization, for a minor to obtain an abortion.

The bill prohibits an individual who has committed incest with a minor from knowingly transporting the minor across a state line to receive an abortion.

Finally, it makes it a crime for a physician to knowingly perform or induce an abortion on an out-of-state minor without first complying with parental notification requirements.