There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing Our Borders and Wilderness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Wilderness Act to authorize U.S. Customs and Border Protection to conduct certain activities to secure the international land borders of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
02/06/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
01/16/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/13/2019
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 02/13/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 02/28/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/28/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 04/30/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/16/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands02/06/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security01/16/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security02/04/2019 Referred to

As of 06/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.612 - Securing Our Borders and Wilderness Act.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.