There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

TRICARE Reserve Select Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to remove the prohibition on eligibility for TRICARE Reserve Select of members of the reserve components of the Armed Forces who are eligible to enroll in a health benefits plan under chapter 89 of title 5, United States Code.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/24/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
01/16/2019Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (117)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 01/16/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/28/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 01/28/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 01/28/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/28/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 01/30/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/04/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/04/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/04/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/04/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 02/04/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/04/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 02/04/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 02/04/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/04/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/05/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/05/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/06/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 02/06/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/06/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/06/2019
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/06/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/07/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 02/07/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/11/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/11/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 02/13/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 02/13/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/13/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/13/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/13/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/13/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 02/14/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/14/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/14/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/22/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/22/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/25/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 02/25/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/26/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/26/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/26/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/26/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 02/27/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 02/28/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 02/28/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 02/28/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/04/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/04/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 03/05/2019
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 03/05/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 03/05/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 03/06/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 03/06/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/07/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 03/11/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 03/11/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 03/11/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 03/13/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 03/14/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/18/2019
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 03/18/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 03/18/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/21/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large] 03/27/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/27/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/29/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 04/01/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/01/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 04/08/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/08/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/08/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 04/12/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 04/12/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 04/12/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 04/12/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/29/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/29/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 05/08/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 05/08/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 05/08/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/14/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/15/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 05/16/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/03/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 06/05/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 06/05/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/10/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/10/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 06/11/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 06/18/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/05/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 07/30/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 07/30/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 09/06/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/10/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/04/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 10/16/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 10/23/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 10/28/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/15/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/17/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/15/2020
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3] 02/25/2020
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/02/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 03/03/2020
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 04/17/2020
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/23/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services01/16/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel01/24/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.613. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/16/2019)

TRICARE Reserve Select Improvement Act

This bill expands TRICARE Reserve Select eligibility to include members of the Selected Reserve who are enrolled or eligible to enroll in the Federal Employees Health Benefits Program.