There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

STEP Improvement Act of 2020

Short Titles as Introduced

STEP Improvement Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the State Trade Expansion Program of the Small Business Administration, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/14/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
03/09/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/15/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
09/14/2020-2:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/14/2020-2:22pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4341-4342)
09/14/2020-2:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6133.
09/14/2020-2:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4341-4344)
09/14/2020-2:07pmHouseMs. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/11/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
03/11/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
03/09/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
03/09/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15]* 03/09/2020
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 03/11/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business03/09/2020 Referred to
03/11/2020 Markup by
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship09/15/2020 Referred to

As of 10/21/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6133 - STEP Improvement Act of 2020


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6133. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/14/2020)

STEP Improvement Act of 2020

This bill reauthorizes through FY2024 the Small Business Administration's (SBA) State Trade Expansion Program, which provides foreign trade assistance to small businesses, and it revises provisions related to the administration of the program.

Specifically, the SBA must establish a time frame for, and provide certain information related to, the application process, and it must conduct an annual survey to solicit feedback on the program. The SBA must collect data on certain performance metrics such as the (1) total number of small businesses assisted by the program, (2) total dollar amount of export sales by participating small businesses, and (3) number of small businesses that have created new jobs through their participation in the program.

The bill also requires applicants for participation to include a budget plan that outlines their intended use of funds awarded under the program.