There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

1921 Silver Dollar Coin Anniversary Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

1921 Silver Dollar Coin Anniversary Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

1921 Silver Dollar Coin Anniversary Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

1921 Silver Dollar Coin Anniversary Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of the Treasury to honor the 100th anniversary of completion of coinage of the "Morgan Dollar" and the 100th anniversary of commencement of coinage of the "Peace Dollar", and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
01/05/2021Became Public Law No: 116-286. (TXT | PDF)
01/05/2021Signed by President.
12/24/2020Presented to President.
12/17/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2020Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
09/22/2020Committee on Financial Services discharged.
03/11/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/05/2021Became Public Law No: 116-286. (TXT | PDF)
01/05/2021Signed by President.
12/24/2020HousePresented to President.
12/18/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/17/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2020SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7643)
09/23/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
09/22/2020-8:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/22/2020-8:22pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H4711-4712)
09/22/2020-8:22pmHouseH.Amdt.887 On agreeing to the Cleaver amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
09/22/2020-8:22pmHouseH.Amdt.887 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Cleaver. (consideration: CR H4711-4712; text: CR H4711-4712)
09/22/2020-8:21pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4711-4712)
09/22/2020HouseCommittee on Financial Services discharged.
09/22/2020-8:21pmHouseMr. Cleaver asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
03/11/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
03/11/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (21)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services03/11/2020 Referred to
09/22/2020 Discharged from
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs09/23/2020 Referred to
12/17/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6192. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-286 (01/05/2021)

1921 Silver Dollar Coin Anniversary Act

(Sec. 3) The Department of the Treasury shall mint and issue $1 coins in recognition of the 100th anniversary of completion of coinage of the Morgan dollar and the 100th anniversary of commencement of coinage of the Peace dollar.

(Sec. 5) Treasury may issue such coins beginning on January 1, 2021.

(Sec.6) Treasury must sell such coins at a price equal to the sum of their face value and the cost of designing and issuing the coins and may make bulk sales of the coins issued at a reasonable discount.