There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

CFTC Reauthorization Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Commodity Futures Trading Commission.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/11/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/11/2020Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/11/2020
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/11/2020
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 03/11/2020
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/17/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/17/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/17/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/17/2020
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 04/17/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/17/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/15/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 06/15/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/15/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 06/15/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/15/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/24/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 06/24/2020
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/25/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 06/25/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/26/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/30/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/30/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 07/09/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/09/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 07/16/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/31/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/31/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 07/31/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 07/31/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 07/31/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/31/2020
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 07/31/2020
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 07/31/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 07/31/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 07/31/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 07/31/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/11/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture03/11/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6197. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/11/2020)

CFTC Reauthorization Act of 2019

This bill reauthorizes through FY2025 the Commodity Futures Trading Commission (CFTC) and generally revises provisions related to the CFTC. Among other things, the bill

  • exempts certain companies from the mandatory swaps clearing requirements if they have less than $10 million in assets,
  • provides for the regulation of digital commodities,
  • exempts certain charitable organizations from commodity trading advisor and commodity pool operator registration requirements,
  • provides that the CFTC's authority to enforce prohibitions regarding fraud and other disruptive trading practices applies to foreign activities,
  • eliminates the double-sided confirmation requirement for swap data repositories, and
  • expands whistleblower protections.