There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

WINGMAN Act
Working to Integrate Networks Guaranteeing Member Access Now Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To title 38, United States Code, to permit veterans to grant access to their records in the databases of the Veterans Benefits Administration to certain designated congressional employees, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/16/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (93)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 01/16/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 01/16/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-12]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 01/16/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 01/22/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 01/22/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 01/23/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/23/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/23/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/23/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 01/23/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 01/24/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 01/24/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 01/24/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 01/30/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 02/05/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 02/07/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/07/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 02/07/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 02/13/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/13/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 02/14/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 03/08/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 03/21/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/21/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/21/2019
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 03/25/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 04/08/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 05/09/2019
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 06/28/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/24/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/16/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs02/08/2019 Referred to

As of 08/23/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.628 - WINGMAN Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.