There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Student Veteran Coronavirus Response Act of 2020

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Student Veteran Coronavirus Response Act of 2020

Short Titles as Introduced

Student Veteran Coronavirus Response Act of 2020

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Student Veteran Coronavirus Response Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To make certain improvements in the educational assistance benefits under the laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs in the case of changes to courses of education by reason of emergency situations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
04/28/2020Became Public Law No: 116-140. (TXT | PDF)
04/28/2020Signed by President.
04/23/2020Presented to President.
04/21/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/31/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On passage, as amended Passed without objection.(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H1869-1870)
03/31/2020Committee on Armed Services discharged.
03/31/2020Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
03/23/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/28/2020Became Public Law No: 116-140. (TXT | PDF)
04/28/2020Signed by President.
04/23/2020HousePresented to President.
04/22/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/21/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2187; text: CR S2187)
04/21/2020SenateReceived in the Senate under the order of 4/21/2020.
03/31/2020-3:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/31/2020-3:03pmHouseOn passage, as amended Passed without objection. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H1869-1870)
03/31/2020HouseCommittee on Armed Services discharged.
03/31/2020HouseCommittee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
03/31/2020-3:03pmHouseWithout objection, the Chair laid before the House H.R. 6322 with an amendment. The reading of the amendment was dispensed with and the amendment was agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H1868-1870)
03/23/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/23/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/23/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/26/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/26/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/26/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/26/2020
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 03/26/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/26/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/26/2020
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 03/26/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/26/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 03/26/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 03/26/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/26/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 03/26/2020
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 03/26/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 03/26/2020
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 03/26/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 03/26/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/26/2020
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 03/26/2020
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 03/26/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 03/26/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 03/26/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/23/2020 Referred to
03/31/2020 Discharged from
House Armed Services03/23/2020 Referred to
03/31/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6322. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-140 (04/28/2020)

Student Veteran Coronavirus Response Act of 2020

This bill addresses education programs and assistance for veterans during the covered period from March 1-December 21, 2020.

Specifically, the bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to continue paying work-study allowances during emergency periods.

The VA is also authorized to continue paying educational assistance and subsistence allowances for a specified amount of time for programs of education that are suspended due to an emergency situation.

An educational assistance payment shall not be charged against an individual's entitlement to educational assistance if an individual was unable to complete a course or program due to the temporary closure of an educational institution or the temporary termination of a program by reason of an emergency situation. This includes assistance related to training and rehabilitation programs for veterans with service-connected disabilities.

The bill extends the time limitation for using educational assistance under the Montgomery GI Bill and the Post-9/11 GI Bill when institutions are closed due to an emergency situation or executive order. The bill also extends the time limitation for participation in a vocational rehabilitation program when such participation is prevented due to an emergency situation or executive order.

The bill authorizes the VA to pay a subsistence allowance for two additional months to a veteran following a program of employment services during the covered period for full-time training for the type of program the veteran was pursuing.