There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Securing America From Epidemics Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Securing America From Epidemics Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize United States participation in the Coalition for Epidemic Preparedness Innovations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/18/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5880-5881)
03/23/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/30/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
11/18/2020-12:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/18/2020-12:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5880-5881)
11/18/2020-12:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6334.
11/18/2020-12:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5880-5882)
11/18/2020-12:41pmHouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/29/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/29/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/03/2020HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/23/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
03/23/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (25)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs03/23/2020 Referred to
07/29/2020 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations04/03/2020 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations11/30/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6334. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (11/18/2020)

Securing America From Epidemics Act

This bill authorizes the United States to participate in the Coalition for Epidemic Preparedness Innovations (CEPI), an alliance of countries and private partners whose mission is to finance and coordinate the development of vaccines for high-priority, epidemic-potential threats.

The President must submit a report outlining (1) planned U.S. contributions to, and participation in, CEPI; (2) the manner and extent to which the United States shall participate in the governance of CEPI; and (3) how participation in CEPI supports U.S. government strategies and programs in health security and biodefense.