There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing and Enabling Commerce Using Remote and Electronic Notarization Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize and establish minimum standards for electronic and remote notarizations that occur in or affect interstate commerce, to require any Federal court located in a State to recognize notarizations performed by a notary public commissioned by another State when the notarization occurs in or affects interstate commerce, and to require any State to recognize notarizations performed by a notary public commissioned by another State when the notarization occurs in or affects interstate commerce or when the notarization was performed under or relates to a public act, record, or judicial proceeding of the State in which the notary public was commissioned.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/23/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/23/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/23/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/23/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (74)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 03/23/2020
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 03/26/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 03/26/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 03/26/2020
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/26/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 03/31/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/31/2020
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 03/31/2020
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 03/31/2020
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 04/07/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/07/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/07/2020
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 04/07/2020
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 04/10/2020
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 04/10/2020
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/14/2020
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 04/23/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 04/23/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 04/23/2020
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/08/2020
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 05/08/2020
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 05/12/2020
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/12/2020
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 05/12/2020
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 05/15/2020
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 05/15/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 05/15/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/19/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 05/22/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 05/22/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 05/27/2020
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/27/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/27/2020
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 05/27/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/27/2020
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/27/2020
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 05/28/2020
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 05/28/2020
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/08/2020
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 06/08/2020
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/11/2020
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/11/2020
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 06/11/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/15/2020
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 06/25/2020
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/25/2020
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 06/25/2020
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 06/29/2020
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 06/29/2020
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/29/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/30/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 06/30/2020
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/09/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/09/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/20/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/20/2020
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/22/2020
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 07/29/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/29/2020
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/29/2020
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/29/2020
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/31/2020
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 08/07/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 08/22/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 08/22/2020
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/01/2020
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 09/01/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 09/01/2020
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/01/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/11/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 09/11/2020
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 09/11/2020
Rep. Tiffany, Thomas P. [R-WI-7] 10/23/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/23/2020 Referred to
House Judiciary03/23/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.