There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the State Department Basic Authorities Act of 1956 to exempt the reimbursement for certain travel to return to the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/23/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/23/2020Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/23/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/23/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/25/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/25/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/25/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/25/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 03/25/2020
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 03/25/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/25/2020
Rep. Bishop, Dan [R-NC-9] 04/10/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 04/10/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 04/10/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/10/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/10/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/10/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/10/2020
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 04/10/2020
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 04/10/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/10/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/10/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/10/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/10/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 05/05/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/05/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/05/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/18/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/23/2020 Referred to

As of 08/15/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6376 - To amend the State Department Basic Authorities Act of 1956 to exempt the reimbursement for certain travel to return to the United States, and for other purposes.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.