There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 327 of the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to clarify that National Urban Search and Rescue Response System task forces may include Federal employees.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
08/22/2019Became Public Law No: 116-48. (TXT | PDF)
08/22/2019Signed by President.
08/13/2019Presented to President.
07/31/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/31/2019Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5216)
04/08/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3111)
04/02/2019Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-29.
01/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/22/2019Became Public Law No: 116-48. (TXT | PDF)
08/22/2019Signed by President.
08/13/2019HousePresented to President.
07/31/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/31/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/31/2019SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5216)
04/09/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
04/08/2019-5:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/08/2019-5:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3111)
04/08/2019-5:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 639.
04/08/2019-5:18pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3111-3112)
04/08/2019-5:18pmHouseMrs. Craig moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/02/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 14.
04/02/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-29.
02/27/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/27/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/27/2019HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged.
02/07/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/17/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
01/17/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/06/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/07/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/17/2019 Referred to
02/27/2019 Markup by
04/02/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-29
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management02/07/2019 Referred to
02/27/2019 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs04/09/2019 Referred to
07/31/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.639. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-48 (08/22/2019)

This bill amends the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to specify that National Urban Search and Rescue Response System task forces may include federal employees.