There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medical Supply Chain Emergency Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the President to use authorities under the Defense Production Act of 1950 to require emergency production of medical equipment to address the COVID-19 outbreak.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/25/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/25/2020Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/25/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (123)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/25/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 03/25/2020
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 04/10/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/10/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 04/10/2020
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 04/10/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/10/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/10/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 04/10/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/10/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 04/10/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/10/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 04/10/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/10/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/10/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/10/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/10/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 04/10/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/10/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/10/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/10/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 04/10/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/10/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/10/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/10/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/10/2020
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/10/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/10/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 04/10/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/10/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 04/10/2020
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/10/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/10/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/10/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/10/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/10/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/10/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 04/10/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/10/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/17/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 04/17/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 04/17/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/17/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/17/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/17/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 04/17/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 04/17/2020
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 04/17/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 04/17/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/17/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 04/28/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 04/28/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 04/28/2020
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 04/28/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 04/28/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/28/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/13/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 05/27/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/27/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 05/27/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/25/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6390. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/25/2020)

Medical Supply Chain Emergency Act of 2020

This bill directs the President to use existing authorities under the Defense Production Act of 1950 with respect to the production of ventilators, N-95 respirator masks, and specified personal protective equipment to address COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). (That act confers upon the President a broad set of authorities to influence domestic industry in order to provide essential materials and goods needed for the national defense.)

The President must (1) make a determination that such items are essential for the national defense, (2) identify private-sector capacity to produce these items, and (3) exercise authorities under the act to require emergency production of them at a reasonable price. In addition, the President shall coordinate the allocation of these items based on requests from governors and the needs of the states as determined by the number of COVID-19 cases and the proportion of the population at higher risk of the disease in a given state.

The bill makes specified funds available for these efforts. Equipment produced under these authorities but unused at the termination of the COVID-19 emergency declared on March 13, 2020, shall be deposited into the Strategic National Stockpile.