Committees: H.R.6395 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Armed Services03/26/2020 Referred to
07/01/2020 Markup by
07/09/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-442 , H. Rept. 116-442,Part 2
07/16/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-442 , H. Rept. 116-442,Part 2
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities03/27/2020 Referred to
06/22/2020 Markup by
06/22/2020 Reported by
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel03/27/2020 Referred to
06/23/2020 Markup by
06/23/2020 Reported by
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness03/27/2020 Referred to
06/23/2020 Markup by
06/23/2020 Reported by
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces03/27/2020 Referred to
06/23/2020 Markup by
06/23/2020 Reported by
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Strategic Forces03/27/2020 Referred to
06/22/2020 Markup by
06/22/2020 Reported by
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Tactical Air and Land Forces03/27/2020 Referred to
06/23/2020 Markup by
06/23/2020 Reported by