There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend the charitable deduction to all taxpayers regardless of whether a taxpayer itemizes deductions in order to encourage and increase charitable giving, and to provide for loans and loan guarantees to certain public charities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/27/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/27/2020Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/27/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 03/27/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 03/27/2020
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 03/27/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/27/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 03/27/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/27/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 03/27/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 03/27/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/10/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/10/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 04/10/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 04/10/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/10/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 04/10/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/10/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/10/2020
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/10/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 04/10/2020
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 04/10/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/10/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 04/21/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 04/21/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/21/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/21/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 04/21/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 04/21/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/21/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/21/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/23/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/23/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/23/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/28/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/28/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 04/28/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/28/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 04/28/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/28/2020
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 04/28/2020
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 05/13/2020
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 05/13/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/13/2020
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 05/13/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/13/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 05/13/2020
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/13/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/13/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/13/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/13/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/13/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/13/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/13/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/19/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/27/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6408. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/27/2020)

This bill allows taxpayers to claim a tax deduction for charitable contributions even if they do not otherwise itemize their deductions.

The bill also directs the Department of the Treasury to make or guarantee loans to tax-exempt charitable organizations. The aggregate amount of such loans may not exceed $60 billion. Treasury must give priority in making such loans to organizations that are providing direct assistance to the COVID-19 (i.e., the coronavirus disease 2019) response effort.