There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Agricultural Worker Program Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve agricultural job opportunities, benefits, and security for aliens in the United States and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/17/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (85)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/17/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/28/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 01/29/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/05/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/07/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/19/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/28/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/08/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/12/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 03/14/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/25/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/25/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 03/27/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 04/04/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 04/04/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/08/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 04/29/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/09/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/17/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/23/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/23/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 08/23/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/03/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 09/20/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 09/24/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/27/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/27/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 10/15/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/17/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship03/04/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/17/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.641. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/17/2019)

Agricultural Worker Program Act of 2019

This bill establishes a program for alien agricultural workers to obtain temporary resident status ("blue card status") and procedures to obtain permanent resident status.

An alien shall qualify for the status if he or she performed the required amount of qualified agricultural work. The Department of Homeland Security may grant blue card status to qualified individuals who pass security checks and are not disqualified for various reasons, such as an aggravated felony conviction. DHS may waive certain disqualifications for humanitarian or public interest reasons.

Blue card holders shall be authorized for employment in the United States and travel outside the United States. Such individuals shall be ineligible for various federal benefits, including the healthcare premium assistance tax credit.

Individuals going through deportation or removal proceedings shall be given a chance to apply for blue card status if they qualify.

Blue card holders may apply for permanent resident status, subject to various requirements, including work requirements over a specified time period and payment of federal taxes. Blue card status shall not last longer than eight years.