There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

All Dependent Children Count Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To allow 2020 recovery rebates with respect to qualifying children over the age of 16.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/31/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/31/2020Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/31/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (156)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 03/31/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 03/31/2020
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 03/31/2020
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 04/03/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/03/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 04/03/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 04/03/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 04/03/2020
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 04/03/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/03/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 04/03/2020
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 04/03/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/03/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 04/03/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/03/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/03/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 04/03/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/03/2020
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/03/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 04/03/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/03/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 04/03/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 04/03/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/03/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/03/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/03/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/03/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 04/03/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 04/03/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/03/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 04/03/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 04/03/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 04/03/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/03/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 04/03/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/03/2020
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 04/07/2020
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/07/2020
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 04/07/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 04/07/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/07/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 04/07/2020
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/07/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/07/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 04/07/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/07/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 04/10/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/10/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/10/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 04/10/2020
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 04/10/2020
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 04/10/2020
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 04/10/2020
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 04/14/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 04/14/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/17/2020
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 04/17/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 04/24/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/24/2020
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 04/24/2020
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 04/24/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/24/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 04/24/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/24/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/24/2020
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 04/28/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/28/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/05/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/08/2020
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 05/12/2020
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/12/2020
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/08/2020
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 07/23/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/23/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/31/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6420. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/31/2020)

All Dependent Children Count Act

This bill extends the 2020 recovery rebates of the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act to all taxpayer dependents.