There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Combating Pandemic Scams Act of 2020

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Combating Pandemic Scams Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Combating Pandemic Scams Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Combating Pandemic Scams Act of 2020

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Combating Pandemic Scams Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Federal Trade Commission to develop and disseminate information to the public about scams related to COVID-19, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
01/05/2021Became Public Law No: 116-287. (TXT | PDF)
01/05/2021Signed by President.
12/24/2020Presented to President.
12/17/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2020Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/17/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5831-5832)
11/16/2020Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-591.
04/03/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/05/2021Became Public Law No: 116-287. (TXT | PDF)
01/05/2021Signed by President.
12/24/2020HousePresented to President.
12/18/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/17/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2020SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7642)
11/18/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
11/17/2020-2:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/17/2020-2:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5831-5832)
11/17/2020-2:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6435.
11/17/2020-2:35pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5831-5833)
11/17/2020-2:35pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/16/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 489.
11/16/2020HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-591.
09/09/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/09/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/03/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
04/03/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce04/03/2020 Referred to
09/09/2020 Markup by
11/16/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-591
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation11/18/2020 Referred to
12/17/2020 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.6435.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.6435. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-287 (01/05/2021)

Combating Pandemic Scams Act of 2020

This bill requires the Federal Trade Commission (FTC), in consultation with relevant agencies, to inform the public about mail, telemarketing, and internet scams related to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). The FTC must establish a national database for such information and must also disseminate information on how to report COVID-19-related scams to the appropriate agency.