There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To allow 2020 recovery rebates to be made on the basis of an individual's taxpayer identification number.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/03/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/03/2020Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/03/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 04/03/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 04/10/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/10/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/10/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 05/08/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/14/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/03/2020 Referred to

As of 08/04/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6438 - To allow 2020 recovery rebates to be made on the basis of an individual's taxpayer identification number.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6438. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/03/2020)

This bill includes as a valid identification number a taxpayer identification number for purposes of the 2020 recovery rebates.