There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Navajo Utah Water Rights Settlement Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Navajo Utah Water Rights Settlement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To approve the settlement of the water rights claims of the Navajo Nation in Utah, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/18/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-673.
01/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
12/18/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 557.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/18/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-673.
02/12/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/12/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/12/2020Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
06/26/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife
02/06/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/17/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/25/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 01/25/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 02/26/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/20/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 06/24/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources01/17/2019 Referred to
02/12/2020 Markup by
12/18/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-673
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife02/06/2019 Referred to
06/26/2019 Hearings by
02/12/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.644. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (12/18/2020)

Navajo Utah Water Rights Settlement Act of 2020

This bill ratifies and modifies the Navajo Utah Water Rights Settlement Agreement negotiated between the Navajo Nation, the United States, and Utah. The agreement gives the Navajo Nation the right to use water from sources located within Utah and adjacent to or encompassed within the boundaries of the Navajo Reservation, provided that depletions do not exceed a specified amount annually.

The Navajo water rights shall be held in trust by the United States for the use and benefit of the Navajo Nation and shall not be subject to forfeiture or abandonment.

The Navajo Nation shall have authority to allocate, distribute, and lease the water rights for any use on or off its reservation in accordance with the agreement.

The Department of the Interior shall establish and manage the Navajo Utah Settlement Trust Fund, with amounts available for withdrawal by the Navajo Nation for planning, designing, constructing, operating, maintaining, and replacing Navajo water development projects.

The bill also specifies waivers and releases that must be executed in order for the settlement to be binding and effective.