There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Coronavirus Community Relief Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for an enhanced Coronavirus relief fund for units of government with a population of 500,000 or less, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/07/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/07/2020Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/07/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (151)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/07/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 04/07/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 04/07/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/10/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 04/10/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/10/2020
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/10/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 04/10/2020
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/10/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/10/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/10/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 04/10/2020
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 04/10/2020
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 04/10/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/10/2020
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 04/10/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 04/10/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 04/10/2020
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/10/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/10/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 04/10/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 04/10/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/10/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 04/10/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/10/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 04/10/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/10/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 04/14/2020
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/14/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 04/14/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/14/2020
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 04/14/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/14/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/14/2020
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/14/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 04/14/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 04/14/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 04/14/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/14/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/17/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 04/17/2020
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/17/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/17/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/17/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/17/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/17/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/17/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 04/17/2020
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/17/2020
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 04/17/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/17/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 04/17/2020
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 04/17/2020
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 04/17/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/17/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/17/2020
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 04/17/2020
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 04/17/2020
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/17/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 04/17/2020
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/17/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/17/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/21/2020
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/21/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/21/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 04/21/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 04/21/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 04/21/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/22/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/22/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 04/24/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 04/28/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 05/01/2020
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/01/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/01/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/08/2020
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/19/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/15/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform04/07/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6467. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/07/2020)

Coronavirus Community Relief Act

This bill provides $250 billion for certain localities affected by the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic.

Specifically, the bill provides funding for FY2020 for units of local government with a population of 500,000 or less. Payment shall be made within 30 days after submission of a specified certification by the locality. The amount of the payment is proportional to population.

Local governments shall use the funds provided to cover only those costs that (1) are necessary and related to the public health emergency caused by COVID-19, and (2) were incurred during the period of March 1-December 30, 2020.

The Office of Inspector General of the Department of the Treasury shall conduct monitoring and oversight of the receipt, disbursement, and use of funds.