There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (33)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2019

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • Agriculture, Rural Development, Food and Drug Administration, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Commerce, Justice, Science, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Department of Commerce Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Department of Housing and Urban Development Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Department of Justice Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Department of State, Foreign Operations, and Related Programs Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Department of Transportation Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Department of the Interior, Environment, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Department of the Treasury Appropriations Act, 201
  • District of Columbia Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Executive Office of the President Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Financial Services and General Government Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Judiciary Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Science Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Transportation, Housing and Urban Development, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2019

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Agriculture, Rural Development, Food and Drug Administration, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Commerce, Justice, Science, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Department of Commerce Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Department of Housing and Urban Development Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Department of Justice Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Department of State, Foreign Operations, and Related Programs Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Department of Transportation Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Department of the Interior, Environment, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Department of the Treasury Appropriations Act, 2019
  • District of Columbia Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Executive Office of the President Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Financial Services and General Government Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Judiciary Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Science Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Transportation, Housing and Urban Development, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
01/23/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 180 (Roll no. 49).(text: CR H1024-1150)
01/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
01/28/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 16.
01/24/2019SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
01/23/2019-3:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/23/2019-3:56pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 180 (Roll no. 49). (text: CR H1024-1150)
01/23/2019-3:46pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 200 - 215 (Roll no. 48).
01/23/2019-3:11pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
01/23/2019-3:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Granger motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to strike all after the enacting clause and insert new text related to payment of employees furloughed during the lapse in appropriations beginning on December 22, 2018.
01/23/2019-3:07pmHouseMs. Granger moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Appropriations. (text: CR H1158)
01/23/2019-3:07pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
01/23/2019-2:02pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 648.
01/23/2019-2:02pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 648 and H.J. Res. 31. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 648 and H.J. Res. 31 under closed rules with one hour of debate for each measure. Rule provides for consideration of motions to suspend the rules through the legislative day of February 1, 2019
01/23/2019-2:01pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 61. (consideration: CR H1024-1159)
01/22/2019-7:17pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 61 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 648 and H.J. Res. 31. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 648 and H.J. Res. 31 under closed rules with one hour of debate for each measure. Rule provides for consideration of motions to suspend the rules through the legislative day of February 1, 2019
01/18/2019-10:35amHouseMs. Roybal-Allard asked unanimous consent that the Chairwoman of the Committee on Appropriations may insert in the Congressional Record, not later than January 18, 2019, such material as she may deem explanatory of H.R. 648. Agreed to without objection.
01/17/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/17/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/17/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations01/17/2019 Referred to
House Budget01/17/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (329)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.648. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (01/23/2019)

Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2019

This bill provides FY2019 appropriations for several federal departments and agencies. It includes 6 of the 12 regular FY2019 appropriations bills:

  • the Agriculture, Rural Development, Food and Drug Administration, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019;
  • the Commerce, Justice, Science, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019;
  • the Financial Services and General Government Appropriations Act, 2019;
  • the Department of the Interior, Environment, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019;
  • the Department of State, Foreign Operations, and Related Programs Appropriations Act, 2019; and
  • the Transportation, Housing and Urban Development, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019.

The departments and agencies funded in the bill include

  • the Department of Agriculture;
  • the Food and Drug Administration;
  • the Department of Commerce;
  • the Department of Justice;
  • science-related agencies, including the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA);
  • the Department of the Treasury,
  • the judiciary;
  • the Executive Office of the President;
  • the District of Columbia;
  • the Department of the Interior;
  • the Environmental Protection Agency;
  • the Forest Service;
  • the Department of State;
  • the Department of Transportation;
  • the Department of Housing and Urban Development; and
  • several related and independent agencies.

The bill also extends several authorities and programs, including

  • the National Flood Insurance Program,
  • the authority for the Environmental Protection Agency to collect and spend certain fees related to pesticides,
  • the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program, and
  • several Medicaid provisions.