There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Recovery Rebates Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow 2020 recovery rebates for individuals filing a joint return if one spouse satisfies the valid identification number requirement.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/10/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/10/2020Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 04/10/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 04/10/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 04/10/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/10/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 04/10/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/10/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/10/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/10/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/10/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/10/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 04/10/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 04/10/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 04/10/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 04/10/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 04/10/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 04/14/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/14/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 04/23/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/23/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 04/23/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/23/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/23/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/23/2020
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 04/28/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/28/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/05/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/05/2020
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/05/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/05/2020
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/05/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/05/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/05/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/05/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/05/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/05/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/12/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/12/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/12/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/12/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 05/12/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 05/12/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/12/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 05/15/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/27/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/04/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/10/2020 Referred to

As of 08/07/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6485 - Recovery Rebates Improvement Act


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6485. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/10/2020)

Recovery Rebates Improvement Act

This bill provides that the valid identification number requirement for the 2020 recovery rebates is satisfied for married couples filing joint tax returns if one spouse provides a valid number.