There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Uyghur Human Rights Policy Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To condemn gross human rights violations of ethnic Turkic Muslims in Xinjiang, and calling for an end to arbitrary detention, torture, and harassment of these communities inside and outside China.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
03/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (104)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/23/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 01/23/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/23/2019
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 01/23/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 01/23/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/29/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 01/29/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 01/29/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/04/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/04/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/04/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 02/07/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/08/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/19/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/19/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/22/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/25/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 02/28/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/05/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 03/06/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/06/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/07/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 03/08/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/08/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/13/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 03/18/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 03/18/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/21/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/21/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/03/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 04/03/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/03/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/08/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/08/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/08/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 04/08/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 04/08/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 04/09/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/12/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/25/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/30/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 04/30/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/01/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/03/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/10/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 05/17/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/20/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/21/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/24/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 05/28/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/30/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 05/30/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/03/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/03/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 06/04/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 06/04/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/06/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 06/06/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 06/10/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/13/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 06/18/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 06/18/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 06/18/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 06/20/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 06/26/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 06/27/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 06/28/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/28/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/02/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/11/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/11/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/11/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/16/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/23/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 08/02/2019
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 08/02/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 08/02/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 08/09/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 08/23/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 08/23/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 08/23/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 08/27/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 08/30/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/06/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 09/11/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 09/17/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 09/19/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/19/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/19/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/17/2019 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)01/17/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary01/17/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship03/04/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/04/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.649. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/17/2019)

Uyghur Human Rights Policy Act of 2019

This bill directs various U.S. government bodies to prepare reports on China's treatment of the Uyghurs, a predominantly Muslim Turkic ethnic group.

The Office of the Director of National Intelligence shall report to Congress on issues including the security threats caused by the Chinese government's reported crackdown on the Uyghur population in Xinjiang province, the frequency with which other governments are forcibly returning Turkic Muslim refugees and asylum seekers to China, and the development or transfer of technology that facilitates mass internment and surveillance.

The Federal Bureau of Investigation shall report on topics such as its efforts to protect ethnic Uyghurs and Chinese nationals in the United States from Chinese government intimidation.

The U.S. Agency for Global Media shall report on media-related matters, including the reach of U.S. media into Xinjiang, assessments of Chinese propaganda strategies, and U.S. actions to counter such efforts to downplay the crackdown.

The Department of State shall report on the scope of the reported crackdown in Xinjiang, including the number of detained individuals, the use of forced labor in the region, an assessment of government surveillance in the province, and U.S. diplomatic efforts to address the crackdown.