There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Money for the People Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the issuance of emergency monthly payments to every American throughout the duration of the coronavirus crisis to be provided by the Department of the Treasury, in consultation with other Federal and State agencies.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/14/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/14/2020Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/14/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/14/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/28/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/28/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/28/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/28/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 04/28/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/28/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 04/28/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/28/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/28/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/28/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/08/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/08/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/08/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/08/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 05/08/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 05/08/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/08/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/08/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/15/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/15/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/04/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/14/2020 Referred to

As of 08/08/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6496 - Emergency Money for the People Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6496. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/14/2020)

Emergency Money for the People Act

This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to make monthly payments during a specified 12-month period to certain citizens and noncitizens of the United States and their dependent children. The amount of such payments shall be $2,000 each month ($4,000 for married couples filing joint returns) and additional amounts for their dependent children. The monthly amount shall be phased out for individuals whose adjusted gross income exceeds $130,000 ($260,000 for joint return filers). The payments must begin within 14 days of the enactment of this bill.

The bill allows such monthly payments for individuals who are not U.S. citizens or residents, but have been physically present in the United States continuously since January 27, 2020 (the effective date of the public health emergency resulting from the COVID-19 [i.e. coronavirus disease 2019] pandemic), and continue to be physically present in the United States throughout the duration of the payment period.

If Treasury does not have sufficient tax return information to make payments to an eligible individual, it shall consult with the Department of Veteran Affairs and the Social Security Administration and any agency making pension or annuity payments to such individual.