There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

America Votes Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Help America Vote Act of 2002 to permit an individual who is subject to a requirement to present identification as a condition of voting in an election for Federal office to meet such requirement by presenting a sworn written statement attesting to the individual's identification, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/17/2019Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/17/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/17/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 01/17/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 01/17/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 01/22/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 01/23/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 03/06/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 06/04/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Committee on House Administration01/17/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.650. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/17/2019)

America Votes Act of 2019

This bill permits an individual required to present identification as a condition of voting in a federal election to meet the requirement by presenting a sworn written statement attesting to the individual's identification and that he or she is registered to vote in the election. An individual desiring to vote by mail may submit such a statement with the ballot.

States with an identification requirement shall (1) prepare a preprinted version of the statement which includes a blank space for an individual to provide a name and signature, (2) make copies of the preprinted version available at polling places, (3) include a copy of the preprinted version with each ballot transmitted to an individual who desires to vote by mail, and (4) include the use of a sworn written statement in voting information posted at polling places.

A state is prohibited from requiring an individual who presents or submits such a sworn written statement to cast a provisional ballot in the election.

The bill does not apply to first-time voters registering by mail.