There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to modify the paycheck protection program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/14/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/14/2020Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/14/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 04/14/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/17/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/17/2020
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/17/2020
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 04/17/2020
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 04/17/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 04/17/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 04/17/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 04/17/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 04/17/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 04/17/2020
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/17/2020
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 04/17/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 04/17/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 04/17/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 04/17/2020
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/17/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 04/17/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/17/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/17/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 04/17/2020
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 04/21/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/21/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 04/21/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/21/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 04/21/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/21/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 04/21/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/21/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 04/21/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 04/21/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 04/21/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 04/21/2020
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 05/01/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 05/01/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 05/01/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/01/2020
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/01/2020
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 05/01/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/01/2020
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/01/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/22/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 07/01/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business04/14/2020 Referred to

As of 08/03/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6506 - To amend the Small Business Act to modify the paycheck protection program, and for other purposes.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6506. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/14/2020)

This bill modifies and establishes additional funding for the Paycheck Protection Program of the Small Business Administration that was implemented in response to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).

Specifically, the bill (1) extends the duration of the program; (2) authorizes loan recipients under the program to request additional, forgivable amounts; and (3) extends the deferral period for such loans to at least one year.