There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

DREAMers, Immigrants, and Refugees (DIRe) Legal Aid Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Attorney General to make grants to nonprofit organizations to offer legal assistance to certain aliens lawfully admitted for permanent residence, DACA recipients, and refugees, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/05/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/17/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 01/17/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/17/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 01/17/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 01/17/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/25/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/14/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/17/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship03/05/2019 Referred to

As of 09/22/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.656 - DREAMers, Immigrants, and Refugees (DIRe) Legal Aid Act


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.656. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/17/2019)

DREAMers, Immigrants, and Refugees (DIRe) Legal Aid Act

This bill directs the Department of Justice to make grants to nonprofit legal services providers to provide immigration law-related services to certain aliens facing removal or at risk of being denied entry into the United States.

The services shall be available to an alien who (1) is lawfully admitted for permanent residence, (2) has received Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals (DACA) status, or (3) qualifies for admission as a refugee or whose spouse or parent so qualifies.

The Department of Homeland Security shall report to Congress about the immigration outcomes of aliens who have legal representation compared to those who do not.