There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Social Determinants of Health Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to carry out a Social Determinants of Health Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/21/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/21/2020Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/21/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 05/01/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 05/19/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/11/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/15/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/18/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/18/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/18/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/22/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/25/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/30/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 07/22/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/24/2020
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/29/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 07/30/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 08/11/2020
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 08/11/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/11/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/21/2020 Referred to

As of 08/13/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6561 - Improving Social Determinants of Health Act of 2020


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6561. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/21/2020)

Improving Social Determinants of Health Act of 2020

This bill requires the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) to establish a program to improve health outcomes and reduce health inequities by, for example, coordinating activities across the CDC. As part of the program, the CDC must award grants to eligible organizations to build capacity to address social determinants of health. The CDC shall provide for an independent evaluation of certain grants and report findings to Congress.