There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Educational Connections Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for E-Rate support for Wi-Fi hotspots, modems, routers, and connected devices during emergency periods relating to COVID-19, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/21/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/05/2020Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E425)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/21/2020Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/21/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (94)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 04/22/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/22/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/22/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 04/22/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/22/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/22/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/22/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/22/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/22/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 04/22/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/23/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 04/23/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 04/23/2020
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 04/23/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/23/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/23/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 04/23/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 04/23/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/23/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/23/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 04/28/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/28/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/28/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/28/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 04/28/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 04/28/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 05/01/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 05/01/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 05/01/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/01/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/01/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/01/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 05/01/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 05/01/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/01/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 05/01/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/01/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 05/01/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/01/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 05/01/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 05/01/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/01/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 05/01/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 05/01/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 05/01/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/01/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/01/2020
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/01/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 05/01/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/01/2020
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/01/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/01/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/05/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/05/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 05/05/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/05/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 05/05/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/05/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/05/2020
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 05/05/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 05/05/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 05/08/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/08/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/08/2020
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 05/08/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 05/08/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 05/08/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/08/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/08/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/08/2020
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/08/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/08/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/08/2020
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/08/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/08/2020
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/13/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/13/2020
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/13/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/13/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/13/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/13/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/13/2020
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 05/19/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/19/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/19/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/19/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 05/22/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/04/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/04/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 07/27/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/21/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6563. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/21/2020)

Emergency Educational Connections Act of 2020

This bill establishes and provides funding for the Emergency Connectivity Fund, from which the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) must provide support for certain schools or libraries to purchase specified telecommunications equipment during the public health emergency declared because of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).

Specifically, the FCC shall provide funds to certain elementary schools, secondary schools, or libraries to purchase telecommunications equipment or services (e.g., Wi-Fi hotspots, modems, and routers) for use by students, staff, or patrons at locations that include locations other than the schools or libraries. Priority must be given to students, staff, or patrons who do not have access to such equipment or services.

Following the emergency period, funding recipients are authorized to use purchased equipment for appropriate purposes but may not sell or transfer such equipment for anything of value, except for upgraded equipment of the same type.