There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

GROCER Act of 2020
Giving Retailers and Our Convenience Employees Relief Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide an exclusion from gross income for certain workers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/21/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/21/2020Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/21/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 05/12/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/21/2020 Referred to

As of 10/26/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6567 - GROCER Act of 2020


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6567. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/21/2020)

Giving Retailers and Our Convenience Employees Relief Act of 2020 or the GROCER Act of 2020

This bill excludes from gross income, for income tax purposes, compensation and other income up to $25,0000 paid to certain retail grocery and gasoline service station employees between the period of February 15, 2020, and June 15, 2020, who are working in a county that has at least one confirmed case of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). The period may be extended for an additional three months if the Department of the Treasury determines that the COVID-19 emergency is likely to be ongoing during such extended period.