There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Robust International Response to Pandemic Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure international financial institution support for a robust international response to the global COVID-19 pandemic.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/21/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/21/2020Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/21/2020Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E376)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/21/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (34)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 04/21/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/21/2020
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 04/28/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/01/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/08/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/08/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/08/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/08/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/08/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/11/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 06/11/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/11/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/11/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/11/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/11/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/11/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 06/11/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/26/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 09/23/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 10/23/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services04/21/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6581. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/21/2020)

Robust International Response to Pandemic Act

This bill requires each U.S. Executive Director at an international financial institution to take certain actions in support of the global response to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).

Specifically, each U.S. Executive Director at an international financial institution (e.g., the International Bank for Reconstruction and Development or the International Finance Corporation) must (1) seek the suspension of debt service payments to the institution and the relaxation of fiscal targets for certain programs, and (2) oppose programs or loan agreements that would reduce countries' health care spending or other spending related to their responses to COVID-19. Further, the U.S. Executive Director at the International Monetary Fund must support the issuance of Special Drawing Rights (a currency support tool) so that governments may access additional resources to finance their responses to COVID-19.