There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Equitable Data Collection and Disclosure on COVID-19 Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to collect and report certain data concerning COVID-19.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/21/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
04/27/2020Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/21/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/21/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/21/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (95)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/21/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 04/21/2020
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 04/21/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/21/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 04/21/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 05/08/2020
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/08/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/30/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 08/04/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/21/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources04/21/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States04/27/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6585. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/21/2020)

Equitable Data Collection and Disclosure on COVID-19 Act

This bill establishes the Commission on Ensuring Health Equity During the COVID-19 Public Health Emergency and adds reporting requirements for certain demographic data related to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).

Among other activities, the commission must (1) determine approaches to using data to reduce demographic disparities in COVID-19 prevalence and outcomes, and (2) submit findings and recommendations to Congress on a specified timeline until the end of the public health emergency.

During the public health emergency, the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) and the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services must publish, and update daily, data on COVID-19 testing, treatment, and outcomes that is disaggregated by race, ethnicity, and other demographic characteristics on the CDC website. In addition, the Indian Health Service shall consult with tribes with respect to COVID-19 data collection and reporting. The Department of Health and Human Services must make a summary of final statistics related to COVID-19 publicly available and report specified information to Congress within 60 days of the end of the public health emergency.