There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

CHILD Act
Community Health Improvement, Leadership, and Development Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve the health outcomes in communities through community-relevant health information and new health supporting incentives and programs funded without further appropriations.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/17/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 01/30/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/17/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/25/2019 Referred to

As of 02/17/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.660 - CHILD Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.660. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/17/2019)

Community Health Improvement, Leadership, and Development Act of 2019 or the CHILD Act

This bill establishes several programs to support community health. Specifically, the bill establishes (1) an integrated database of epidemiological and health-claims information to monitor illness rates and associated health care costs; and (2) a grant program to support local community health improvement programs for the purposes of maintaining, disseminating, and reporting on database information.