There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

COVID-19 Testing, Reaching, And Contacting Everyone (TRACE) Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Health and Human Services to award grants to eligible entities to conduct diagnostic testing for COVID-19, and related activities such as contact tracing, through mobile health units and, as necessary, at individuals' residences, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/01/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/01/2020Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/01/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/01/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 05/01/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/01/2020
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/05/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/05/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/05/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/05/2020
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/05/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 05/05/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 05/12/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/12/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/12/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/12/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/12/2020
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/12/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/12/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/12/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 05/12/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/12/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/12/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/12/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 05/12/2020
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 05/12/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 05/22/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/22/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 05/22/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/22/2020
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/22/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/22/2020
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2]* 05/01/2020 05/15/2020 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/01/2020 Referred to

As of 06/03/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6666 - COVID-19 Testing, Reaching, And Contacting Everyone (TRACE) Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6666. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/01/2020)

COVID-19 Testing, Reaching, And Contacting Everyone (TRACE) Act

This bill authorizes the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) to award grants for testing, contact tracing, monitoring, and other activities to address COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Entities such as federally qualified health centers, nonprofit organizations, and certain hospitals and schools are eligible to receive such grants. In awarding the grants, the CDC shall prioritize applicants that (1) operate in hot spots and medically underserved communities, and (2) agree to hire individuals from the communities where grant activities occur.