There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

American Dream Employment Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Consolidated and Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018, to enable the payment of certain officers and employees of the United States whose employment is authorized under the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/17/2019Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (86)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 01/17/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 02/11/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 02/11/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 02/11/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 02/11/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 02/11/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 02/11/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/11/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/11/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/11/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/11/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/11/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/11/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/11/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 02/11/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/11/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/11/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/11/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 02/11/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/11/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/11/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/11/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/11/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/11/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/11/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/11/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 02/11/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/11/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/11/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/11/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/11/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/25/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/25/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 03/07/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/07/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/07/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/07/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/07/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 03/07/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/07/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 03/26/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/26/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 04/12/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/12/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/12/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 04/12/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 04/12/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/12/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/12/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 04/12/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/12/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 04/12/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/12/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/12/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/12/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 04/12/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/15/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 04/15/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/18/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 04/18/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/25/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 04/25/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/29/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/30/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 04/30/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/30/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/30/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/03/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/08/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 05/09/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration01/17/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.