There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Restricting First Use of Nuclear Weapons Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the conduct of a first-use nuclear strike absent a declaration of war by Congress.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/17/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/17/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/17/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 01/17/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/17/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/28/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/28/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/28/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 01/28/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 02/07/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/07/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/13/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/13/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/25/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 03/21/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/25/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/30/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/21/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/02/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 08/30/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/30/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/06/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 09/06/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 10/30/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs01/17/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.669. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/17/2019)

Restricting First Use of Nuclear Weapons Act of 2019

This bill prohibits the President from conducting a nuclear strike against an enemy that did not first launch a nuclear strike against the United States or a U.S. ally, unless Congress expressly authorizes such a strike.