There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Local Chamber, Tourism, and 501(c)(6) Protection Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to expand the Paycheck Protection Program for certain organizations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/05/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/05/2020Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/05/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (126)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 05/08/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 05/08/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/08/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 05/08/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/08/2020
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2020
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 05/08/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 05/08/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/08/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 05/08/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/08/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 05/08/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 05/08/2020
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/08/2020
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 05/08/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/08/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 05/08/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 05/08/2020
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 05/08/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/08/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 05/08/2020
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/08/2020
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 05/08/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/08/2020
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/08/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/08/2020
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 05/08/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 05/08/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 05/08/2020
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/08/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/08/2020
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 05/08/2020
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 05/08/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 05/08/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/08/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/08/2020
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 05/08/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/08/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 05/08/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/08/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 05/08/2020
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 05/08/2020
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 05/08/2020
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 05/08/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 05/08/2020
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 05/08/2020
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/08/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/08/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 05/08/2020
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/08/2020
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 05/08/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/08/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/08/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/08/2020
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/08/2020
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/08/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/08/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/12/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/12/2020
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/12/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/12/2020
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 05/12/2020
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 05/12/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/12/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/12/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 05/12/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 05/12/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/12/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 05/12/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 05/12/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/12/2020
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21] 05/12/2020
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/12/2020
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 05/12/2020
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 05/12/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/12/2020
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/12/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 05/12/2020
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/12/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/12/2020
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/12/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 05/12/2020
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 05/12/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/12/2020
Del. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 05/12/2020
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 05/12/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/22/2020
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 05/22/2020
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/22/2020
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 05/22/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/22/2020
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/22/2020
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/22/2020
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 05/22/2020
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 05/22/2020
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 05/22/2020
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/26/2020
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/04/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/04/2020
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/11/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/11/2020
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 06/22/2020
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 06/24/2020
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 06/29/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/09/2020
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/13/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 07/16/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 07/16/2020
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 07/22/2020
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 07/27/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 07/29/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 08/07/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 08/14/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Small Business05/05/2020 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6697.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6697. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/05/2020)

Local Chamber, Tourism, and 501(c)(6) Protection Act of 2020

This bill modifies the Paycheck Protection Program implemented by the Small Business Administration in response to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) to include certain entities and exclude certain individuals.

Specifically, the bill expands the program to encompass organizations with 300 or fewer employees that (1) operate under section 501(c)(6) of the Internal Revenue Code (other than a professional football league), or (2) are a destination marketing organization engaged in promoting communities and facilities to businesses and leisure travelers.

The bill also narrows the definition of payroll costs under the program to exclude any compensation of an employee who is a registered lobbyist from the calculation for loan amounts or for allowable uses of funds provided under the program.