There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Opportunities for Heroes Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a commission to determine essential employment during the COVID-19 crisis period and provide loan repayment and education credit to workers employed in such essential employment during such crisis, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/05/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
05/05/2020Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/05/2020Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/05/2020Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/05/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/05/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/08/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/08/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2020
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/08/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 05/08/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/08/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/12/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/12/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/15/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 05/15/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/15/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/15/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/15/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/27/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/11/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/11/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/11/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/15/2020

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor05/05/2020 Referred to
House Financial Services05/05/2020 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/05/2020 Referred to

As of 08/09/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6699 - Opportunities for Heroes Act of 2020


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.