There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Employee Retroactive Pay Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the compensation of Federal employees and other government employees furloughed during a Government shutdown, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/03/2019Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (94)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/03/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/03/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/08/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/08/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 01/08/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 01/08/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 01/08/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/08/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/08/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/08/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/08/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 01/08/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/08/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/08/2019
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/08/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 01/08/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 01/08/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/10/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 01/10/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 01/10/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 01/10/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 01/10/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/10/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/10/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 01/10/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/10/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 01/11/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 01/11/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/11/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 01/11/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/11/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/11/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 01/11/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 01/25/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 01/25/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform01/03/2019 Referred to

As of 09/25/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.67 - Federal Employee Retroactive Pay Fairness Act


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.67. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2019)

Federal Employee Retroactive Pay Fairness Act

This bill requires federal employees and District of Columbia public employees furloughed due to a lapse in appropriations that begins on or about December 22, 2018, to be compensated at their standard rate of compensation for the period of such lapse as soon as practicable after such lapse ends.