There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting the Dignity of Unborn Children Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit the unlawful disposal of fetal remains, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/17/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/22/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 01/22/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/24/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 01/24/2019
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/29/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 01/29/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 01/29/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 02/06/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/13/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 04/15/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/17/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/04/2019 Referred to

As of 08/25/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.671 - Protecting the Dignity of Unborn Children Act of 2019


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.671. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/17/2019)

Protecting the Dignity of Unborn Children Act of 2019

This bill establishes a new criminal offense for recklessly disposing of or abandoning fetal remains in a landfill or in any navigable waters of the United States.

The term "fetal remains" means any part (except a cremated part) of a deceased human fetus following an abortion.

A violator is subject to a fine, up to three years in prison, or both.