There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Clean Water for All Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit implementation of a rule defining "waters of the United States" under the Federal Water Pollution Control Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/08/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/11/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/08/2020Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/08/2020
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 06/08/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/08/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 06/08/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 06/08/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 06/08/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/08/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/08/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/08/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/08/2020
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/08/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/08/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/08/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 06/08/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 06/08/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/08/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 06/08/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/08/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/08/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/08/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/08/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/08/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/08/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/08/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/08/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/08/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/08/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/08/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/08/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/08/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 06/08/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/08/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/08/2020
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/08/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 06/22/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/22/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/22/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 06/22/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/22/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 06/22/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/22/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 06/22/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/22/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/22/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/31/2020
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/31/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 07/31/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/31/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 07/31/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/31/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 08/04/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/08/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment05/11/2020 Referred to

As of 08/07/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6745 - Clean Water for All Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6745. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/08/2020)

Clean Water for All Act

This bill nullifies the 2020 rule titled The Navigable Waters Protection Rule: Definition of "Waters of the United States," which describes the bodies of water that fall under federal jurisdiction and the scope of the Clean Water Act. The 2020 rule replaces the 2015 Clean Water Rule, which includes a broader definition of waters of the United States.

The Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) and the Army Corps of Engineers must promulgate a regulation defining waters of the United States under the Clean Water Act. The EPA and the Corps must ensure that such definition includes categories of water bodies that affect the physical, chemical, or biological integrity of traditionally navigable and interstate waters, based on the best available scientific evidence. In addition, the EPA and the Corps must ensure that implementation of the Clean Water Act using such definition will prevent any degradation of surface water quality, increased contaminant levels in drinking water sources, increased flooding-related risks to human life or property, or disproportionate adverse impacts on minority or low-income populations.