There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

21st Century President Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

21st Century President Act

Short Titles as Introduced

21st Century President Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend gendered terms in Federal law relating to the President and the President's spouse.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/10/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5332)
07/09/2019Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-139.
01/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
07/11/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
07/10/2019-4:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/10/2019-4:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5332)
07/10/2019-3:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 677.
07/10/2019-3:56pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5332-5334)
07/10/2019-3:56pmHouseMs. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/09/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 102.
07/09/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-139.
06/12/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
06/12/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/04/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/17/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/17/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 01/24/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 01/30/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/19/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/22/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/22/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/22/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/22/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/25/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/26/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/26/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 02/26/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 02/28/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 03/05/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/05/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 03/05/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/08/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/08/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/12/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/12/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 03/12/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 03/12/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/14/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/21/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 03/21/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/21/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 03/21/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 03/25/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/25/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/25/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 03/25/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 04/01/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 04/02/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/10/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/08/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/10/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/10/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 05/15/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/04/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/12/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 07/09/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/17/2019 Referred to
06/12/2019 Markup by
07/09/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-139
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/04/2019 Referred to
Senate Judiciary07/11/2019 Referred to

As of 10/22/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.677 - 21st Century President Act


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.677. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (07/10/2019)

21st Century President Act

This bill revises the definition of "immediate family" for purposes of a criminal offense involving a threat to kill, kidnap, or inflict bodily harm on a former President or a member of the immediate family of a former President.

Specifically, it replaces gender-specific references to a former President's "wife" and "widow" with gender-neutral terms "spouse" and "surviving spouse."