There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fair Compensation for Low-Wage Contractor Employees Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide back pay to low-wage contractor employees, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 01/17/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 01/24/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 01/24/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 01/24/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 01/28/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 01/28/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. [D-IL-4] 01/28/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/28/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/28/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 01/29/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/29/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 01/29/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 01/31/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/31/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/31/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 01/31/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 01/31/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/31/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 01/31/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 01/31/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/31/2019
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 01/31/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/31/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 01/31/2019
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/31/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/31/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 01/31/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/31/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/31/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/31/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/05/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/05/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/05/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 02/05/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/05/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 02/05/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/07/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 02/08/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/11/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/11/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 02/11/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 02/14/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/14/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 02/25/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 02/25/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 03/04/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 03/04/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/02/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/03/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/09/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations01/17/2019 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform01/17/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.678. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/17/2019)

Fair Compensation for Low-Wage Contractor Employees Act of 2019

This bill appropriates funding to provide compensation to certain employees of contractors who lost pay or leave due to the lapse in appropriations that began on December 22, 2018.

Each agency subject to such lapse shall adjust the price of any contract for which the contractor was ordered to suspend, delay, or stop work as a result of the lapse. The agency shall compensate the contractor for reasonable costs incurred to (1) provide compensation, at an employee's standard rate of compensation, to any employee who was furloughed or laid off, or who was not working, who experienced a reduction of hours, or who experienced a reduction in compensation, as a result of the lapse, for the period of the lapse; or (2) restore paid leave taken by any employee during the lapse, if the contractor required employees to use paid leave as a result of the lapse.

The maximum amount of weekly compensation of an employee for which an adjustment may be made may not exceed the lesser of the employee's actual weekly compensation or $965.