There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Rental Assistance and Rental Market Stabilization Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide emergency rental assistance under the Emergency Solutions Grants program of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development in response to the public health emergency resulting from the coronavirus, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/12/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/12/2020Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (158)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/12/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/12/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 05/12/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 05/12/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/12/2020
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 05/12/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 05/12/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/12/2020
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 05/12/2020
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 05/14/2020
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/14/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 05/14/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 05/14/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/14/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/14/2020
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 05/15/2020
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 05/28/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/28/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 05/28/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 05/28/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/28/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/28/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/25/2020
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 06/25/2020
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 06/25/2020
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/25/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/25/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/25/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/25/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/25/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/25/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services05/12/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.